EP4198817 - SYSTEM, METHOD, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR RETRAINING A PRE-TRAINED OBJECT CLASSIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axis AB Gränden 1 223 69 Lund / SE | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tullberg, Joacim 223 69 LUND / SE | [2023/25] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [2023/25] | Application number, filing date | 21214232.7 | 14.12.2021 | [2023/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4198817 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4198817 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F18/214, G06F18/24, G06V10/764, G06V10/774, G06V20/70 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
G06V10/764 (EP,KR,US);
G06V10/774 (EP,KR,US);
G06F18/214 (EP);
G06F18/24 (EP);
G06N3/08 (KR);
G06T7/292 (US);
G06V10/62 (KR);
G06V10/776 (US);
G06V10/993 (KR);
G06V20/49 (KR);
G06V20/70 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10016 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/25] | G06K9/62, G06V10/764, G06V10/774, G06V20/70 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/25] | Title | German: | SYSTEM, VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM ZUM ERNEUTEN TRAINIEREN EINES VORTRAINIERTEN OBJEKTKLASSIFIKATORS | [2023/25] | English: | SYSTEM, METHOD, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR RETRAINING A PRE-TRAINED OBJECT CLASSIFIER | [2023/25] | French: | SYSTÈME, PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE DE RÉAPPRENTISSAGE DE CLASSIFICATEUR D'OBJETS PRÉ-FORMÉ | [2023/25] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2022 | Examination requested [2023/25] | 07.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2017039455 (TEICHMAN ALEXANDER WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,14,15 * paragraphs [0036] , [0038] , [0041] , [0045] - [0046] * [I] 3,5-13; | [X]US2021042530 (KIM JI EUN [US], et al) [X] 1,14,15* paragraphs [0023] - [0028] - [0041] - [0042] - [0055] - [0061] - [0067] *; | [X] - FOROUGHI HOMA ET AL, "Robust people counting using sparse representation and random projection", PATTERN RECOGNITION, (20151001), vol. 48, no. 10, doi:10.1016/J.PATCOG.2015.02.009, ISSN 0031-3203, pages 3038 - 3052, XP029177379 [X] 1,14,15 * sections 3.2 - 3.4 section 4.2 section 6.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.patcog.2015.02.009 |