EP4015240 - TIRE COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR MAKING THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kraton Polymers Research B.V. Asterweg 19A1 1031 HL Amsterdam / NL | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERVELDE, Jochem H.W. Houston, Texas 77084 / US | 02 /
PICHEREAU, Jeremie G. Houston, Texas 77084 / US | 03 /
VAN HERRIKHUYZEN, Jeroen Houston, Texas 77084 / US | 04 /
SCHAAPMAN, Mark Houston, Texas 77084 / US | 05 /
EDUARD, Pieter Houston, Texas 77084 / US | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [2022/25] | Application number, filing date | 21215075.9 | 16.12.2021 | [2022/25] | Priority number, date | US202063199335P | 21.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063199335 P | [2022/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4015240 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60C1/00, C08L21/00, C08L93/04, C08L15/00, C08L9/00 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
B60C1/00 (EP,KR);
C08L21/00 (KR);
C08L9/06 (CN,US);
B60C1/0016 (EP,CN,US);
C08J3/18 (US);
C08K3/04 (US);
C08K3/22 (US);
C08K3/36 (US);
C08K5/09 (US);
C08K5/5419 (US);
C08L15/00 (EP);
C08L93/04 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08L15/00, C08L9/00, C08L7/00, C08L93/04, C08L91/00, C08L91/06, C08L45/00, C08K3/04, C08K3/36, C08K5/548, C08K3/22, C08K5/09, C08K5/18, C08K5/31, C08K3/06, C08K5/47, C08K5/18 (EP);
C08L9/06, C08L9/00, C08L7/00, C08L93/04, C08K3/36 (CN) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] |
Former [2022/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REIFENZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2022/25] | English: | TIRE COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR MAKING THEREOF | [2022/25] | French: | COMPOSITION DE PNEUMATIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2022/25] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 28.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | Date: | 12.10.2022 | [2022/51] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016251503 (CHENCHY JEFFERY LIN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0202] , [0207]; examples 2-10 *; | [A]US10738178 (SAKURAI HIDEYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * example 7 ** column 19, lines 28-31 *; | [A]US2020317890 (HATANAKA AKITO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * example 5 * * paragraph [0112] * |