EP4016418 - MANAGEMENT OF A PORTFOLIO OF ASSETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 855 S. Mint Street Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRISHNASWAMY, Meenakshi Sundaram Charlotte, 28202 / US | 02 /
VIENGKHAM, Manyphay Charlotte, 28202 / US | 03 /
REDVERS, Simon Charlotte, 28202 / US | 04 /
BHANDARI, Ajit Charlotte, 28202 / US | 05 /
RAJASEKARAN, Sasi Alias Ezil Madhavan Charlotte, 28202 / US | 06 /
RICE, Eric L. Charlotte, 28202 / US | 07 /
RYSKO, Garrett M. Charlotte, 28202 / US | 08 /
PILLUTLA, Krishna Charlotte, 28202 / US | 09 /
DHOLAKIA, Ashoomi Charlotte, 28202 / US | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/25] | Stepney, Gregory John Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 21215152.6 | 16.12.2021 | [2022/25] | Priority number, date | US202063127559P | 18.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063127559 P | US202163133652P | 04.01.2021 Original published format: US 202163133652 P | IN202111038629 | 26.08.2021 Original published format: IN202111038629 | US202117546943 | 09.12.2021 Original published format: US202117546943 | [2022/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4016418 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06, G06Q10/00 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06313 (EP,KR);
G06Q10/06315 (EP,KR);
G06Q10/0639 (CN,KR);
G06Q40/06 (KR,US);
G06F3/04815 (KR,US);
G06F3/167 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWALTUNG EINES PORTFOLIOS VON VERMÖGENSWERTEN | [2022/25] | English: | MANAGEMENT OF A PORTFOLIO OF ASSETS | [2022/25] | French: | GESTION D'UN PORTEFEUILLE D'ACTIFS | [2022/25] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 03.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2020067789 (KHUTI BHARAT [US], et al); | [I]US2020074374 (PERRYMAN OLIVIA MARGOT [CA], et al) |