EP4033338 - DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Display Co., Ltd. 128, Yeoui-daero, Yeongdeungpo-gu SEOUL, 07336 / KR | [2022/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, CheolSe 10845 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, JuHan 10845 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Kim, Jinseong 10845 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Lee, Haewon 10845 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2022/30] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2022/30] | Application number, filing date | 21215428.0 | 17.12.2021 | [2022/30] | Priority number, date | KR20200189510 | 31.12.2020 Original published format: KR 20200189510 | [2022/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4033338 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4033338 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/044 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
G06F3/0443 (EP);
G06F3/0412 (CN,KR,US);
H01L27/156 (CN);
G06F3/04164 (US);
G06F3/04166 (US);
G06F3/04184 (EP);
G06F3/044 (US);
G06F3/0445 (EP);
H01L25/0753 (KR);
H01L25/167 (KR);
H01L27/1214 (KR);
H01L27/124 (EP);
H10K59/12 (CN);
H10K59/131 (CN);
H10K59/40 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/19] |
Former [2022/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2022/30] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE | [2022/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2022/30] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/30] | 04.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011298746 (HOTELLING STEVEN PORTER [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0053]; figures 3-5 *; | [Y]KR20160046965 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 12,13 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0057]; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US2017371213 (WANG LEI [CN], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2018088716 (KIM MIN SOO [KR]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0144] - paragraph [0161]; figures 15A,15B *; | [A]EP3605208 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD [CN], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [I]EP3675178 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [IY]KR20200079856 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1-11 * the whole document * [Y] 12,13; | [I] - Microchip, "Single-Zone 3D Gesture Controller Data Sheet", INET, (20121211), pages 1 - 40, URL: http://ww1.microchip.com/downloads/en/DeviceDoc/41667A.pdf, (20130301), XP055054982 [I] 14,15 * the whole document * |