EP4039681 - N-((HET)ARYLMETHYL)-HETEROARYL-CARBOXAMIDES COMPOUNDS AS PLASMA KALLIKREIN INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kalvista Pharmaceuticals Limited Porton Science Park Bybrook Road Porton Down, Salisbury SP4 0BF Wiltshire / GB | [2022/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIE, Rebecca Louise Wiltshire, SP4 0BF / GB | 02 /
EDWARDS, Hannah Joy Wiltshire, SP4 0BF / GB | 03 /
EVANS, David Michael Wiltshire, SP4 0BF / GB | 04 /
HODGSON, Simon Teanby Bedforshire, MK45 2NR / GB | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2022/32] | Application number, filing date | 21215491.8 | 26.11.2015 | [2022/32] | Priority number, date | GB20140021083 | 27.11.2014 Original published format: GB 201421083 | [2022/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4039681 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, C07D413/14, A61K31/415, A61K31/454, A61K31/4709, A61K31/497, A61K31/506, C07D231/14, C07D401/06, C07D401/10, C07D403/10, C07D409/14 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
A61K31/4439 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
C07D401/10 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,CN,IL,RU,US);
A61K31/415 (RU);
A61K31/445 (IL,US);
A61K31/454 (RU);
A61K31/4709 (RU);
A61K31/496 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/497 (RU);
A61K31/506 (RU);
A61P19/02 (RU);
A61P27/02 (RU);
A61P29/00 (RU);
A61P3/10 (RU);
A61P43/00 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A61P7/02 (RU);
A61P7/10 (RU);
A61P9/00 (US);
A61P9/02 (RU);
A61P9/10 (RU);
C07D231/14 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
C07D401/06 (EP,CN,IL,RU,US);
C07D403/10 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] |
Former [2022/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 09.02.2023 | ME | 09.02.2023 | Validation states | MA | 09.02.2023 | MD | 09.02.2023 | Title | German: | N-((HET)ARYLMETHYL)-HETEROARYL-CARBOXAMID-VERBINDUNGEN ALS PLASMA-KALLIKREIN-INHIBITOREN | [2022/32] | English: | N-((HET)ARYLMETHYL)-HETEROARYL-CARBOXAMIDES COMPOUNDS AS PLASMA KALLIKREIN INHIBITORS | [2022/32] | French: | COMPOSÉS DE N-((HÉT)ARYLMÉTHYL)HÉTÉROARYLE-CARBOXAMIDES EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE LA KALLICRÉINE PLASMATIQUE | [2022/32] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/11] | 09.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 11.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15804210.1 / EP3224256 | EP19176610.4 / EP3556752 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 11.05.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 11.05.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.05.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005049578 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-5,11-15 * Formula (I); Intermediate 107; Example 46;; claim - *; | [X]WO2007113289 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,11-15 * Formula (I); Compounds D68, E36, D70; page 26; claim - *; | [YD]WO2012017020 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [YD] 1-15 * Formula (I); page 58; example 79; claim - *; | [YD]WO2013111108 (NOVARTIS AG [CH]) [YD] 1-15 * Formula (I); page 26; example -; claim -; compounds 15, 16, 27 *; | [YD]WO2014108679 (KALVISTA PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [GB]) [YD] 1-15 * Formula (I);; examples 25, 55, 56, 84, 124, 132-133; claim 22 *; | [XPI]WO2014188211 (KALVISTA PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [GB]) [XP] 1-3,5-9,11-15 * Formula (I);; example -; claim - * [I] 1-15; | [X] - Chemical catalogue: AKos Consulting and Solutions GmbH, "2-Thiophenecarboxamide", REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20081218), XP055244196 [X] 1-4,7 * the whole document * | [X] - Chemical catalogue: AKos Consulting and Solutions GmbH, "2-Thiophenecarboxamide, 4-[(3,5-dimethyl-1H-pyrazol-4-yl)methyl]-N-[(1-ethyl-2- pyrrolidinyl)methyl]-5-(4-morpholinyl)", REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20090122), Database accession no. 1094996-93-6, XP055244198 [X] 1-4,7 * the whole document * | [X] - Chemical catalogue: Ukrorgsyntez Ltd, "1H-Pyrazole-4-carboxamide, N-[[4-[[(2-amino-2-oxoethyl)amino]carbonyl]phenyl]methyl]-3-(4- methylphenyl)-1-[(4-methylphenyl)methyl]-", REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20120803), Database accession no. 1386189-59-8, XP055244204 [X] 1-3,5,6 * the whole document * | [X] - Chemical Catalogue: Ambinter, "1H-Pyrazole-4-carboxamide,N-[[4-(acetylamino)phenyl]methyl]-3-(4-methylphenyl)-1-[(4-methylphenyl)methyl]-", REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20090802), Database accession no. 1171693-25-6, XP055244636 [X] 1-3,5,6 * the whole document * | [X] - Registry, "Chemical Catalog extract", Registry, (20140328), pages 1 - 3, URL: www.stnext.org, (20201111), XP055749595 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * | [X] - Anonymous, "Benzoic acid, 4-[[[(1-[(3-chlorophenyl) methyl]-3-methyl-1H-pyrazol-4yl]carbonyl]amino]methyl]-2-methoxy-", REGISTRY, Chemical Abstracts, (20140324), Database accession no. 1572751-33-7, URL: STN, XP055933991 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO9204371 | US5187157 | WO9429335 | WO9507921 | WO03076458 | EP1426364 | WO2005123680 | WO2008016883 | WO2008049595 | WO2010142801 | EP2281885 | WO2011118672 | WO2012004678 | WO2012009009 | WO2012017020 | WO2013111107 | WO2013111108 | WO2014108679 | - K. D. BHOOLA et al., "Kallikrein-Kinin Cascade", Encyclopedia of Respiratory Medicine, pages 483 - 493 | - J. W. BRYANT, "Human plasma kallikrein-kinin system: physiological and biochemical parameters", Cardiovascular and haematological agents in medicinal chemistry, (20090000), vol. 7, doi:10.2174/187152509789105444, pages 234 - 250, XP055783779 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/187152509789105444 | - K. D. BHOOLA, Pharmacological Rev., (19920000), vol. 44, page 1 | - D. J. CAMPBELL, "Towards understanding the kallikrein-kinin system: insights from the measurement of kinin peptides", Brazilian Journal of Medical and Biological Research, (20000000), vol. 33, pages 665 - 677 | - F. MARCEAUD. REGOLI, Nature Rev., Drug Discovery, (20040000), vol. 3, pages 845 - 852 | - A. LEHMANN, "Ecallantide (DX-88), a plasma kallikrein inhibitor for the treatment of hereditary angioedema and the prevention of blood loss in on-pump cardiothoracic surgery", Expert Opin. Biol. Ther., vol. 8, doi:10.1517/14712598.8.8.1187, pages 1187 - 99, XP008153852 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/14712598.8.8.1187 | - A. CLERMONT et al., "Plasma kallikrein mediates retinal vascular dysfunction and induces retinal thickening in diabetic rats", Diabetes, (20110000), vol. 60, pages l590 - 98 | - GARRETT et al., "Peptide aldehyde...", J. Peptide Res., (19980000), vol. 52, pages 62 - 71 | - T. GRIESBACHER, "Involvement of tissue kallikrein but not plasma kallikrein in the development of symptoms mediated by endogenous kinins in acute pancreatitis in rats", British Journal of Pharmacology, (20020000), vol. 137, doi:10.1038/sj.bjp.0704910, pages 692 - 700, XP002252617 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.bjp.0704910 | - D. M. EVANS et al., Immunolpharmacology, (19960000), vol. 32, pages 115 - 116 | - J. STURZBECHER et al., Brazilian J. Med. Biol. Res, (19940000), vol. 27, pages 1929 - 34 | - TENO et al., Chem. Pharm. Bull., (19930000), vol. 41, pages 1079 - 1090 | - W. B. YOUNG et al., "Small molecule inhibitors of plasma kallikrein", Bioorg. Med. Chem. Letts., (20060000), vol. 16, doi:10.1016/j.bmcl.2005.12.060, pages 2034 - 2036, XP025107021 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2005.12.060 | - OKADA et al., "Development of potent and selective plasmin and plasma kallikrein inhibitors and studies on the structure-activity relationship", Chem. Pharm. Bull., (20000000), vol. 48, pages 1964 - 72, XP002189579 | - ZHANG et al., "Discovery of highly potent small molecule kallikrein inhibitors", Medicinal Chemistry, (20060000), vol. 2, pages 545 - 553 | - KOLTE et al., "Biochemical characterization of a novel high-affinity and specific kallikrein inhibitor", British Journal of Pharmacology, (20110000), vol. 162, no. 7, doi:10.1111/j.1476-5381.2010.01170.x, pages 1639 - 1649, XP055783781 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1476-5381.2010.01170.x | - "BCX4161, An Oral Kallikrein Inhibitor: Safety and Pharmacokinetic Results Of a Phase 1 Study In Healthy Volunteers", Journal of Allergy and Clinical Immunology, (20140200), vol. 133, page AB39 | - "A Simple, Sensitive and Selective Fluorogenic Assay to Monitor Plasma Kallikrein Inhibitory Activity of BCX4161 in Activated Plasma", Journal of Allergy and Clinical Immunology, (20140200), vol. 133, page AB40 | - S. PATEL, Retina, (20090600), vol. 29, pages S45 - 8 | - The Practice of Medicinal Chemistry, (20030000), pages 561 - 585 | - F. J. LEINWEBER, Drug Metab. Res., (19870000), vol. 18, page 379 | - LIANGCHEN, Expert Opinion in Therapeutic Patents, (20010000), vol. 11, no. 6, pages 981 - 986 | - H. LIEBERMANL. LACHMAN, Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms: Tablets, Marcel Dekker, (19800000), vol. 1 | - CAS , no. 318496-66-1 | - JOHANSEN et al., Int. J. Tiss. Reac., (19860000), vol. 8, page 185 | - SHORI et al., Biochem. Pharmacol., (19920000), vol. 43, page 1209 | - STURZEBECHER et al., Biol. Chem. Hoppe-Seyler, (19920000), vol. 373, page 1025 |