EP4109276 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR REMOTE TESTING OF DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L & T Technology Services Limited DLF IT SEZ Park 2nd Floor Block 3 1/124 Mount Poonamallee Road Ramapuram, Tamil Nadu Chennai 600 089 / IN | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SWAIN, Nikita 560049 Bangalore / IN | 02 /
SUMANTH, Roshan Raj Manuel 560064 Bangalore / IN | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A., et al Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2022/52] | Bongiovanni, Simone, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 21215731.7 | 17.12.2021 | [2022/52] | Priority number, date | IN202141028452 | 24.06.2021 Original published format: IN202141028452 | [2022/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4109276 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/36, G06F11/32 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
G06F11/3688 (EP);
H04L43/50 (US);
G06F11/323 (EP);
G06F11/3664 (EP);
G06F11/3696 (EP);
H04L12/4633 (US);
H04L43/14 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR FERNPRÜFUNG VON VORRICHTUNGEN | [2022/52] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR REMOTE TESTING OF DEVICES | [2022/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'ESSAIS À DISTANCE DE DISPOSITIFS | [2022/52] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 17.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US9928151 (RODRIGUEZ VALADEZ PEDRO DE JESUS [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7-11,14,15 * the whole document * * abstract * * column 2, line 17 - line 23 * * column 2, line 46 - line 55 * * column 4, line 16 - line 22 * * column 4, line 25 - line 37 * * column 9, line 9 - line 12 * * column 9, line 55 - column 10, line 1 * * column 17, line 34 - line 39 * [I] 3-6,12,13; | [A] - KAASILA JOUKO ET AL, "Testdroid : automated remote UI testing on Android", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 11TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MOBILE AND UBIQUITOUS MULTIMEDIA, MUM '12, New York, New York, USA, doi:10.1145/2406367.2406402, ISBN 978-1-4503-1815-0, (20120101), page 1, URL: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2406367.2406402, (20220506), XP055918635 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2406367.2406402 |