EP4202582 - METHOD OF OPERATION OF A PROCESS PLANT, SOFT SENSOR AND DIGITAL PROCESS TWIN SYSTEM AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21216479.2 | 21.12.2021 | [2023/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4202582 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/418 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
G05B19/41885 (EP);
G05B2219/33002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER PROZESSANLAGE, SOFT-SENSOR UND DIGITALES PROZESS-ZWILLINGSSYSTEM | [2023/26] | English: | METHOD OF OPERATION OF A PROCESS PLANT, SOFT SENSOR AND DIGITAL PROCESS TWIN SYSTEM AND USE THEREOF | [2023/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT, CAPTEUR SOUPLE ET SYSTÈME DE JUMEAU DE TRAITEMENT NUMÉRIQUE | [2023/26] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2023/48] | 18.09.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO2021130311 (COMPANIA ESPANOLA DE PETROLEOS S A U [ES]); |