EP4019646 - METHODS AND KITS FOR DETECTING SPERM DNA FRAGMENTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bonraybio Co., Ltd. 4F-. No. 118, Gongye 9th Rd. Dali Dist. Taichung City 41280 / TW | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HSU, Cheng-Teng 41280 Taichung City / TW | 02 /
CHANG, Li-Sheng 41280 Taichung City / TW | 03 /
LEE, Hsiu-Chin 41280 Taichung City / TW | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Keltie LLP No. 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2022/26] | Application number, filing date | 21216691.2 | 21.12.2021 | [2022/26] | Priority number, date | TW20200145792 | 23.12.2020 Original published format: TW 109145792 | US202117643161 | 07.12.2021 Original published format: US202117643161 | [2022/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4019646 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6806 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6806 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6806, C12Q2527/125, C12Q2527/137, C12Q2563/159, C12Q2563/173, C12Q2565/601 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/26] | C12Q1/6806, G01N1/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] |
Former [2022/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND KITS ZUM NACHWEIS DER DNA-FRAGMENTIERUNG VON SPERMIEN | [2022/26] | English: | METHODS AND KITS FOR DETECTING SPERM DNA FRAGMENTATION | [2022/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET KITS DE DÉTECTION DE FRAGMENTATION D'ADN DU SPERME | [2022/26] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 05.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1710320 (UNIV MADRID AUTONOMA [ES]) [A] 1-14 * claims 1,12-14 *; | [IA]EP2637019 (UNIV BARCELONA AUTONOMA [ES]) [I] 11-14 * claims 1-5,32-33 * * paragraphs [0032] , [0 44] - [0047] - [0 49] , [0 53] - [0057] - [0063] , [0090] * [A] 1-10; | [I] - ENCISO M ET AL, "A new method to analyze boar sperm DNA fragmentation under bright-field or fluorescence microscopy", THERIOGENOLOGY, LOS ALTOS, CA, US, vol. 65, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.THERIOGENOLOGY.2005.05.044, ISSN 0093-691X, (20060120), pages 308 - 316, (20060120), XP025076295 [I] 1-14 * abstract * * page 310, paragraph 2 - page 312 * * page 314, paragraph last - page 315, paragraph 3 * * figures 1-2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.theriogenology.2005.05.044 | [I] - CORTÉS-GUTIÉRREZ EI ET AL, "Assessment of Sperm DNA Fragmentation in Stallion ( Equus caballus ) and Donkey ( Equus asinus ) Using the Sperm Chromatin Dispersion Test", REPRODUCTION IN DOMESTIC ANIMALS, DE, (20091001), vol. 44, no. 5, doi:10.1111/j.1439-0531.2008.01091.x, ISSN 0936-6768, pages 823 - 828, XP055921085 [I] 1-14 * abstract * * page 823, column r, paragraph 2 * * page 824, column l, paragraph last - column r, paragraph 2 * * page 825; figure 1 * * page 826, column r - page 827, column l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1439-0531.2008.01091.x | [A] - ANKEM M K ET AL, "Novel assay for determining DNA organization in human spermatozoa: Implications for male factor infertility", UROLOGY, BELLE MEAD, NJ, US, (20020401), vol. 59, no. 4, doi:10.1016/S0090-4295(01)01619-3, ISSN 0090-4295, pages 575 - 578, XP002343631 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0090-4295(01)01619-3 | [A] - PANNER SELVAM MANESH KUMAR ET AL, "A systematic review on sperm DNA fragmentation in male factor infertility: Laboratory assessment", ARAB JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, (20180318), vol. 16, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.aju.2017.12.001, ISSN 2090-598X, pages 65 - 76, XP055919956 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.aju.2017.12.001 | by applicant | - B.M.A. CARVALHO et al., Sep. Purif. Rev., (20140000), vol. 43, pages 241 - 262 | - JANAKY NARAYANAN et al., J. Phys. Conf. Ser., (20060000), vol. 28, pages 83 - 86 |