EP4024169 - AN EYE GAZE TRACKING SYSTEM, ASSOCIATED METHODS AND COMPUTER PROGRAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.10.2023 [2023/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tobii AB Box 743 182 17 Danderyd / SE | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rosell, Mikael 182 17 Danderyd / SE | 02 /
Johansson, Simon 182 17 Danderyd / SE | 03 /
Rana, Pravin Kumar 182 17 Danderyd / SE | 04 /
Wang, Yimu 182 17 Danderyd / SE | 05 /
Remon Salazar, Gilfredo 182 17 Danderyd / SE | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 21216870.2 | 22.12.2021 | [2022/27] | Priority number, date | US202017136640 | 29.12.2020 Original published format: US202017136640 | [2022/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4024169 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06V40/18 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
G06F3/013 (EP,US);
H04N13/366 (CN);
G06T7/74 (US);
G06V40/193 (EP);
H04N13/371 (CN);
G06T2207/30201 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/05] |
Former [2022/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BLICKVERFOLGUNGSSYSTEM, ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMME | [2022/27] | English: | AN EYE GAZE TRACKING SYSTEM, ASSOCIATED METHODS AND COMPUTER PROGRAMS | [2022/27] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SUIVI DU REGARD, PROCÉDÉS ET PROGRAMMES INFORMATIQUES ASSOCIÉS | [2022/27] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/05] | 23.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2019108383 (KLINGSTRÖM ANDREAS [SE], et al) [X] 1-9,11,12,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0136]; figures 1-6; table 1 * * paragraph [0139] - paragraph [0141] * * paragraph [0145] - paragraph [0202]; figures 8-11 * * paragraph [0215] - paragraph [0243] * [I] 10,13; | [A]WO2019187808 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2019317598 (ALEEM IDRIS S [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0021] ** paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0099]; figures 1-3 *; | [XI]US2020183490 (KLINGSTRÖM ANDRES [SE], et al) [X] 1-9,11,12,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0136]; figures 1-6; table 1 * * paragraph [0139] - paragraph [0141] * * paragraph [0145] - paragraph [0202]; figures 8-11 * * paragraph [0215] - paragraph [0243] * [I] 10,13; | [A]US2020241635 (COHEN DAVID [IL]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0067]; figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0136]; figures 4-11 * * paragraph [0152] - paragraph [0159]; figures 12, 13 *; | [P]US2021019493 (YOKOYAMA MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [P] * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0208]; figures 1-13 * | by applicant | US7572008 | US9041787 | WO2019185136 | - ELIAS DANIEL GUESTRINMOSHE EIZENMAN, "General Theory of Remote Gaze Estimation Using the Pupil Center and Corneal Reflections", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, (20060600), vol. 53, no. 6 | - DIANA BORZA et al., "Real-Time Detection and Measurement of Eye Features from Color Images", Sensors (Basel, (20160716), vol. 16, no. 7, doi:10.3390/s16071105, page 1105, XP055620085 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/s16071105 |