EP4023835 - A ROOF WINDOW SYSTEM WITH A COVER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VKR Holding A/S Breeltevej 18 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSEN, Rasmus 2970 Hørsholm / DK | 02 /
BAUMGARDT, Uffe Grønheden 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | AWA Denmark A/S Strandgade 56 1401 Copenhagen K / DK | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 21216882.7 | 22.12.2021 | [2022/27] | Priority number, date | DK2020PA70880 | 30.12.2020 Original published format: DK PA202070880 | [2022/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4023835 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4023835 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E04D13/03, E04D13/147 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
E04D13/031 (EP,DK);
E04B7/18 (DK);
E04D13/1475 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] |
Former [2022/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DACHFENSTERSYSTEM MIT EINER ABDECKANORDNUNG | [2022/27] | English: | A ROOF WINDOW SYSTEM WITH A COVER ASSEMBLY | [2022/27] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FENÊTRE DE TOIT AVEC UN ENSEMBLE COUVRANT | [2022/27] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 05.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | MC | 11.10.2023 | RO | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SK | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | ES | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SK | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | ES | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 12.01.2024 | |
IS | 11.02.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3791088 (SANDOW K, et al); | [A]DE2443098 (SCHMIDT & CO A [AT]); | [A]DE3206871 (VELUX GMBH BAUZUBEHOER); | [A]DE19653007 (KUEBLE MARKUS [DE]); | [A]US6212834 (LINDGREN CLAES [DK]); | [A]EP2568094 (FAKRO PP SPOLKA Z OGRANICZONA ODPOWIEDZIALNOSCIA [PL]); | [A]DE202019106959U (ROTO FRANK DACHSYSTEM TECH GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | EP1581706 | EP2677092 |