EP4202270 - MULTI-PORT VALVE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 29.12.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 31.01.2024 [2024/05] | 29.12.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 31.01.2024 [2024/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ESBE AB Bruksgatan 22 333 75 Reftele / SE | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRUBER, Mattias 331 35 Värnamo / SE | 02 /
ELEBO, Joi 333 75 Reftele / SE | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21217067.4 | 22.12.2021 | [2023/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4202270 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16K11/07 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
F16K11/0716 (EP);
F16K11/07 (CN);
F16K31/04 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/05] |
Former [2023/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRWEGEVENTILANORDNUNG | [2023/26] | English: | MULTI-PORT VALVE ASSEMBLY | [2023/26] | French: | ENSEMBLE SOUPAPE MULTIPORT | [2023/26] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/05] | 22.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]GB589095 (AUTOMOTIVE PROD CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-3,7,8,10,11,13 * page 4, lines 68-117; figure 1 * [A] 4,5,9,12 [I] 6; | [XA]DE1108027 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [X] 1-5,7,8,10,11,13 * figures 2, 6 *[A] 6,9,12; | [XA]WO2017034456 (SCANIA CV AB [SE]) [X] 1,3-5,7-13 * control unit (9); page 6, lines 8-16; figures 4a, 4b; claims 10-12 * [A] 2,6; | [XA]CN111536267 (SHENZHEN TIANBANGMEI TECH CO LTD) [X] 1,7,8,10,11,13 * figures 1, 5 * [A] 2-6,9,12 |