EP4027218 - DETACHABLE ELECTRICAL DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 SHIMOMARUKO 3-CHOME OHTA-KU Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2022/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAITO, Shoko Tokyo, 146-8501 / JP | [2022/28] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2022/28] | Application number, filing date | 21217383.5 | 23.12.2021 | [2022/28] | Priority number, date | JP20210003014 | 12.01.2021 Original published format: JP 2021003014 | [2022/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4027218 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4027218 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/24, G06F1/28, G06F1/324, G06F1/3296, G06F15/78 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
G06F1/28 (EP,US);
H04N23/50 (CN);
H04N23/617 (US);
G06F1/24 (EP);
G06F1/324 (EP);
G06F1/3296 (EP);
G06F13/385 (US);
G06F15/7871 (EP);
G06V10/94 (US);
H04N23/54 (CN);
H04N23/55 (CN);
H04N23/66 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2022/28] | G06F1/24, G06F1/324, G06F1/3296, G06F15/78 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/08] |
Former [2022/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ABNEHMBARE ELEKTRISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2022/28] | English: | DETACHABLE ELECTRICAL DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF | [2022/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRIQUE AMOVIBLE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2022/28] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/08] | 13.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 03.04.2024 | [2024/44] | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2019332482 (SHEN JIN QUAN [SG], et al); | by applicant | JP2016052057 |