EP4043552 - METHODS FOR CULTURING STEM AND PROGENITOR CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Minerva Biotechnologies Corporation 40 Bear Hill Rd. Waltham, MA 02451 / US | For all designated states Bamdad, Cynthia 356 Marlborough, Unit 2 Boston, MA 02115 / US | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAMDAD, Cynthia Boston, MA 02115 / US | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 21217395.9 | 11.06.2010 | [2022/33] | Priority number, date | US200918631009P | 11.06.2009 Original published format: US 18631009 P | US201032377910P | 13.04.2010 Original published format: US 32377910 P | [2022/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4043552 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/02, C12N11/00, C12N11/06 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP);
C12N5/0607 (KR);
G01N33/57492 (KR,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N11/16 (KR);
C12N5/0606 (EP,US);
C12N5/0647 (KR,US);
C12N5/0695 (KR,US);
G01N33/56966 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] |
Former [2022/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KULTIVIERUNG VON STAMMZELLEN UND VORLÄUFERZELLEN | [2022/33] | English: | METHODS FOR CULTURING STEM AND PROGENITOR CELLS | [2022/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE CULTURE DE CELLULES SOUCHES ET PROGÉNITRICES | [2022/33] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 17.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10786954.7 / EP2440652 | EP19194005.5 / EP3633024 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO02056022 (MINERVA BIOTECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006173171 (BAMDAD CYNTHIA C [US]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006105448 (MINERVA BIOTECHNOLOGIES CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2009042814 (MINERVA BIOTECHNOLOGIES CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-4* the whole document * | by applicant | - FRASCHINI, C.VIGNON, M.R., "Selective oxidation of primary alcohol groups of P-cyclodextrin mediated by 2,2,6,6-tetramethylpiperidine-1-oxyl radical (TEMPO", Carbohydrate Research, (20000000), vol. 328, no. 4, doi:10.1016/S0008-6215(00)00129-4, pages 585 - 589, XP004218900 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0008-6215(00)00129-4 |