EP4203389 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DECENTRALIZED AUDITING OF A BLOCKCHAIN NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAJ, Arun 635110 Hosur, Tamil Nadu / IN | 02 /
SINGH, Saurabh Narayan 81739 München / DE | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/26] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Patentanwälte PartG mbB Ganghoferstraße 29a 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21217472.6 | 23.12.2021 | [2023/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4203389 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/40, H04L9/00, G06F21/56 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
H04L63/1425 (EP);
G06F21/566 (EP);
H04L63/101 (EP);
H04L63/1433 (EP);
H04L9/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR DEZENTRALEN PRÜFUNG EINES BLOCKCHAIN-NETZWERKES | [2023/26] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DECENTRALIZED AUDITING OF A BLOCKCHAIN NETWORK | [2023/26] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'AUDIT DÉCENTRALISÉ D'UN RÉSEAU DE CHAÎNE DE BLOCS | [2023/26] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2021 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 03.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/21] | 19.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP3688929 (ALIBABA GROUP HOLDING LTD [KY]) [Y] 1-10 * page 53 - page 68 *; | [Y] - ELLUL JOSHUA ET AL, "Runtime Verification of Ethereum Smart Contracts", 2018 14TH EUROPEAN DEPENDABLE COMPUTING CONFERENCE (EDCC), IEEE, (20180910), doi:10.1109/EDCC.2018.00036, pages 158 - 163, XP033443198 [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * figure 2 * * pages 161,163 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/EDCC.2018.00036 | [A] - KING'S COLLEGE LONDON (KCL), "PDL -11 smart contracts drafting session outcome", vol. ISG PDL Permissioned Distributed Ledger, (20211005), pages 1 - 62, ETSI DRAFT; PDL(21)000_132, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS ; FRANCE, URL: ftp://docbox.etsi.org/ISG/PDL/05-Contributions/2021/PDL(21)000_132_PDL_-11_smart_contracts_drafting_session_outcome.docx, (20211005), XP014414711 [A] 1-10 * sections 6.3.14, 6.3.15, 6.4.1.3m 9.5-9.9 * | [A] - RENIERS VINCENT VINCENT RENIERS@CS KULEUVEN BE ET AL, "Authenticated and auditable data sharing via smart contract", 26TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTELLIGENT USER INTERFACES, ACMPUB27, NEW YORK, NY, USA, (20200330), doi:10.1145/3341105.3373957, ISBN 978-1-4503-8175-8, pages 324 - 331, XP058611586 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/3341105.3373957 | [A] - LIU BOWEN ET AL, "SMACS: Smart Contract Access Control Service", 2020 50TH ANNUAL IEEE/IFIP INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DEPENDABLE SYSTEMS AND NETWORKS (DSN), IEEE, (20200629), doi:10.1109/DSN48063.2020.00039, pages 221 - 232, XP033800645 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/DSN48063.2020.00039 |