EP4164347 - SLIDE RAIL ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states King Slide Works Co., Ltd. No. 299, Shun-an Road, Hou-Hsiang Village Lu-Chu Dist. Kaohsiung City / TW | For all designated states King Slide Technology Co., Ltd. No. 6, Luke 9th Rd. Kaohsiung Science Park Lujhu Dist. Kaohsiung City / TW | [2023/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Ken-Ching Kaohsiung City / TW | 02 /
YANG, Shun-Ho Kaohsiung City / TW | 03 /
YU, Kai-Wen Kaohsiung City / TW | 04 /
WANG, Chun-Chiang Kaohsiung City / TW | [2023/15] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2023/15] | Application number, filing date | 21217487.4 | 23.12.2021 | [2023/15] | Priority number, date | TW20210137254 | 05.10.2021 Original published format: TW 110137254 | [2023/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4164347 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/14, A47B88/43 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
H05K7/1489 (EP);
F16M13/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLEITSCHIENENANORDNUNG | [2023/15] | English: | SLIDE RAIL ASSEMBLY | [2023/15] | French: | ENSEMBLE RAIL COULISSANT | [2023/15] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/15] | 05.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3644695 (KING SLIDE WORKS CO LTD [TW], et al) [A] 1-12* paragraphs [0009] - [0026] *; | [XI]TWI718056B (KING SLIDE WORKS CO LTD [TW], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11 * abstract * [I] 4,12; | EP3905865 [ ] (KING SLIDE WORKS CO LTD [TW], et al) | by applicant | US9629460 | US10980345 |