EP4023151 - DETECTING ELECTRODE WIRE NOISE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/27] | SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND PROCESSES FOR DETECTING ELECTRODE WIRE NOISE | ||
[2024/01] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd 4 Hatnufa Street Yokneam, 2066717 / IL | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOTZER, Lior 2066717 Yokneam / IL | 02 /
BAR-TAL, Meir 2066717 Yokneam / IL | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 21217710.9 | 24.12.2021 | [2022/27] | Priority number, date | US202017136596 | 29.12.2020 Original published format: US202017136596 | [2022/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4023151 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4023151 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0538, // A61B18/00, A61B34/20, A61B18/14, A61B5/00 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
A61B5/7217 (EP,IL,US);
A61B18/12 (CN);
A61B18/14 (CN);
A61B5/067 (IL,US);
A61B5/287 (IL,US);
A61B5/318 (CN);
A61B5/6859 (EP,IL);
A61M25/0127 (IL,US);
G01R29/26 (IL,US);
A61B2018/00196 (EP,IL);
A61B2018/00351 (CN);
A61B2018/00839 (EP,IL);
A61B2018/1475 (EP,IL);
A61B2034/2048 (EP,IL);
A61B2034/2051 (EP,IL);
|
Former IPC [2022/27] | A61B5/0538, // A61B18/00, A61B34/20, A61B18/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] |
Former [2022/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DETEKTION VON ELEKTRODENDRAHTRAUSCHEN | [2024/01] | English: | DETECTING ELECTRODE WIRE NOISE | [2024/01] | French: | DÉTECTION DE BRUIT DE FIL D'ÉLECTRODE | [2024/01] |
Former [2022/27] | SYSTEME, VERFAHREN UND PROZESSE ZUR DETEKTION VON ELEKTRODENDRAHTRAUSCHEN | ||
Former [2022/27] | SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND PROCESSES FOR DETECTING ELECTRODE WIRE NOISE | ||
Former [2022/27] | SYSTÈMES, PROCÉDÉS ET PROCESSUS DE DÉTECTION DE BRUIT DE FIL D'ÉLECTRODE | Examination procedure | 06.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 06.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2010076454 (BOS DENNIS ERWIN [NL]); | [XAI]US2011152712 (CAO HONG [US], et al); | [XAI]US2020170525 (OSADCHY DANIEL [IL], et al) | by applicant | US5391199 | US5443489 | US5558091 | US5944022 | US5983126 | US6172499 | US6177792 | US6456864 | US6690963 | US6788967 | US6892091 |