EP4029800 - PALLET COLLAR, PALLET COLLAR SYSTEM AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEFAB AB Box 2184 550 02 Jönköping / SE | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steibert, Mattias 749 50 Ekolsund / SE | 02 /
Lu, Qinxin Shanghai / CN | 03 /
Nowak, David 3500 Hasselt / BE | 04 /
Pihl, Andreas Hong Kong / CN | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Bjerkén Hynell KB P.O. Box 1061 101 39 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/29] | Bjerkén Hynell KB Tulegatan 53 113 53 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 21217862.8 | 27.12.2021 | [2022/29] | Priority number, date | SE20210050043 | 18.01.2021 Original published format: SE 2150043 | [2022/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4029800 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4029800 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65D19/06, // B65D21/08 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
B65D19/06 (EP,CN);
B65D19/38 (CN,SE);
B65D19/20 (US);
B65D19/44 (CN);
B65D21/083 (EP);
B65D2519/00159 (EP,CN,SE,US);
B65D2519/00194 (US);
B65D2519/00273 (EP);
B65D2519/00293 (EP);
B65D2519/00323 (EP);
B65D2519/00333 (EP);
B65D2519/00422 (EP);
B65D2519/00497 (EP);
B65D2519/00502 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00527 (EP,SE);
B65D2519/00532 (EP);
B65D2519/00537 (US);
B65D2519/00597 (SE);
B65D2519/00606 (SE);
B65D2519/00621 (EP,SE);
B65D2519/00626 (CN);
B65D2519/00641 (EP,SE);
B65D2519/00676 (EP);
B65D2519/00711 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] |
Former [2022/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PALETTENKRAGEN, PALETTENKRAGENSYSTEM UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG | [2022/29] | English: | PALLET COLLAR, PALLET COLLAR SYSTEM AND USE THEREOF | [2022/29] | French: | COLLIER DE PALETTE, SYSTÈME DE COLLIER DE PALETTE ET SON UTILISATION | [2022/29] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | 16.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 09.08.2023 | ES | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | MC | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 09.08.2023 | |
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 09.08.2023 | |
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 09.08.2023 | |
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 09.11.2023 | |
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 09.11.2023 | |
GR | 10.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9403716U (WELLPAPPE ANSBACH SCHUMACHER G [DE]) [A] 1-15 * page 5 - page 9; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE202015106316U (SPEIDEL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0024] * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO2018063046 (HOLMBERG ANDERS [SE], et al) [A] 1-15* page 2 - page 4; figures 1-3 * |