EP4023840 - HANDLE LOCK ASSEMBLY WITH SEALING FEATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.06.2023 [2023/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mesan Kilit Anonim Sirketi Ali Pasa Köyü Mevkli Sanayi Mahallesi.37.Sok.No:7 Silivri 34570 Istanbul / TR | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SERBET, Turgay Istanbul / TR | 02 /
YASAR, Mahir Istanbul / TR | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Sevinç, Erkan Istanbul Patent A.S. Plaza-33, Büyükdere Cad. No: 33/16 Sisli 34381 Istanbul / TR | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 21217970.9 | 28.12.2021 | [2022/27] | Priority number, date | TR20200022579 | 30.12.2020 Original published format: TR 202022579 | [2022/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4023840 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E05B13/10 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
E05B13/10 (EP);
E05B3/00 (CN);
E05B17/002 (EP);
E05B7/00 (EP);
E05C9/021 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GRIFFVERRIEGELUNGSANORDNUNG MIT DICHTUNGSMERKMAL | [2022/27] | English: | HANDLE LOCK ASSEMBLY WITH SEALING FEATURE | [2022/27] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE VERROUILLAGE DE POIGNÉE AVEC ÉLÉMENT D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ | [2022/27] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/24] | 31.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5452596 (YAMADA KENICHI [JP]) [A] 1-15* column 3, line 9 - column 7, line 23; figures 3-6 *; | [XI]US5722269 (SIMON PETER [DE], et al) [X] 1,7,11 * column 5, line 29 - column 8, line 34; figures 1-13 * [I] 2-6,8-10,12-15; | [A]DE20107170U (RAMSAUER DIETER [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]CN103114778 (BEIJING XINLI CREATE ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [AD]TR201904289U (MESAN KILIT ANONIM SIRKETI [TR]) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | TR201904289U |