Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
06.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
30.08.2024 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | |
30.08.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
30.08.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
20.05.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
19.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
19.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
30.12.2022 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
30.12.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.02.2023 [2023/05] |
30.12.2022 | Change - designated states | published on 01.02.2023 [2023/05] |
03.06.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
29.12.2021 | Change - representative |