EP4201666 - A NON-SLIP COMPOSITE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teknomelt Teknik Mensucat Sanayi Ve Ticaret Anonim Sirketi Organize Sanayi Bölgesi 1, Cadde No:12 Merkez 46000 Kahramanmaras / TR | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARABUGA, Semistan KAHRAMANMARAS / TR | 02 /
KEBELI, Duhan Soysan KAHRAMANMARAS / TR | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Yamankaradeniz, Kemal Destek Patent, Inc. Maslak Mah. Büyükdere Cad., No: 243 Kat: 13, Spine Tower, Sariyer 34485 Istanbul / TR | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21218424.6 | 31.12.2021 | [2023/26] | Priority number, date | TR20210020782 | 23.12.2021 Original published format: TR 202120782 | [2023/26] | Filing language | TR | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4201666 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/02, B32B27/12, B32B27/32 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
B32B5/022 (EP);
B32B27/12 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B2255/10 (EP);
B32B2255/26 (EP);
B32B2262/0253 (EP);
B32B2307/718 (EP);
B32B2307/7265 (EP);
B32B2307/7376 (EP);
B32B2307/744 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RUTSCHFESTE VERBUNDSTRUKTUR | [2023/26] | English: | A NON-SLIP COMPOSITE STRUCTURE | [2023/26] | French: | STRUCTURE COMPOSITE ANTIDÉRAPANTE | [2023/26] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 14.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/37] | 15.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4822669 (ROGA ROBERT C [US]) [X] 1-9 * column 2, line 11 - column 3, line 31; figures 1, 2 *; | [A]EP1199056 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 2,3 * paragraph [0179] - paragraph [0199] *; | [X]EP0987993 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0047]; claims 1-9 *; | [X]US2006286334 (HARPOLE GREGORY S [US]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0037]; figures 1, 2; claims 1-20 *; | [AD]JP2007118288 (DAISHOWA PAPER PRODUCTS CO LTD) [AD] 1-9* the whole document * | by applicant | JP2007118288 | JP2013226361 | TR202018495 | TR19782019104 |