EP4099127 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRAINING A MACHINE LEARNING ALGORITHM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 03.05.2023 [2023/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAE SYSTEMS plc 6 Carlton Gardens London SW1Y 5AD / GB | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department Warwick House P.O. Box 87 Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | [2022/49] | Application number, filing date | 21275071.5 | 02.06.2021 | [2022/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4099127 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/06 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
G05D1/0692 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METHODE UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM TRAINIEREN EINES MASCHINELLEN LERNALGORITHMUS | [2022/49] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRAINING A MACHINE LEARNING ALGORITHM | [2022/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR L'ENTRAÎNEMENT D'UN ALGORITHME D'APPRENTISSAGE AUTOMATIQUE | [2022/49] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2023/18] | 26.12.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2020089247 (SHKURTI FLORIAN [CA], et al) [X] 1-4,7-14 * paragraphs [0040] , [0055] , [0041] , [0036] , [0069] , [0054]; figure 2 *[I] 5,6,15 |