EP4160142 - ULTRASOUND METHOD FOR INSPECTING A PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.2023 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renishaw PLC New Mills Wotton-under-Edge, Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Rolfe, Edward William, et al Patent Department Renishaw plc New Mills Wotton-under-Edge Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 21275137.4 | 29.09.2021 | [2023/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4160142 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01B17/02, G01N29/22 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
G01B17/02 (EP);
G01N29/07 (EP);
G01N29/11 (EP);
G01N2291/011 (EP);
G01N2291/02854 (EP);
G01N2291/044 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLVERFAHREN ZUR INSPEKTION EINES TEILS | [2023/14] | English: | ULTRASOUND METHOD FOR INSPECTING A PART | [2023/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ULTRASONORE POUR L'INSPECTION DE PIÈCE | [2023/14] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US2017276651 (HALL LIAM [GB]) [YD] 10,11* paragraphs [0075] - [0081]; figures 2-3 *; | [XI]CN107063145B (UNIV DALIAN TECH) [X] 1,6-8 * paragraphs [0026] - [0040]; figures 2-4 * [I] 2-5; | [XYI]US2018328896 (KARAFFA BRUCE FALCO [US]) [X] 1,6-9 * paragraphs [0025] - [0040]; figures 1-2 * [Y] 10,11 [I] 2-5 | by applicant | US5189806 | GB2440959 | WO2009024783 | US2009178482 | WO2016051147 | WO2016051148 | WO2020174214 |