EP4191088 - STRAIN WAVE GEARING AND DRIVE ARRANGEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAE SYSTEMS plc 6 Carlton Gardens London SW1Y 5AD / GB | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department Warwick House P.O. Box 87 Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 21275175.4 | 02.12.2021 | [2023/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4191088 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16D51/12, F16D63/00, // F16D125/68 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
B64C13/28 (EP);
B60T1/062 (EP);
B64C13/341 (EP);
B64C13/505 (EP);
F16D49/04 (EP);
F16D63/006 (EP);
F16D2125/68 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DEHNUNGSWELLENGETRIEBE UND ANTRIEBSANORDNUNGEN | [2023/23] | English: | STRAIN WAVE GEARING AND DRIVE ARRANGEMENTS | [2023/23] | French: | ENGRENAGE À ONDE DE DÉFORMATION ET AGENCEMENTS D'ENTRAÎNEMENT | [2023/23] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9531650 (SONG JAE HYOU [KR]) [X] 1-4* figure - *; | [X]EP3279512 (HAMILTON SUNDSTRAND CORP [US]) [X] 1-4 * figure - * |