Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.02.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
14.06.2023 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | |
05.05.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] |
03.12.2021 | Change - representative |