Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2023099867 | Global Dossier | 08.06.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB202117387 | 02.12.2021 | EP21275176 | 02.12.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2613381 | 07.06.2023 | A | GB202117387D0 | 19.01.2022 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB202117387 | 02.12.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW202335907 | 16.09.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | GB202117387 | 02.12.2021 | EP21275176 | 02.12.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4190692 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP21275176 | 02.12.2021 |