EP4190692 - DRIVE ARRANGEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAE SYSTEMS plc 6 Carlton Gardens London SW1Y 5AD / GB | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department Warwick House P.O. Box 87 Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 21275176.2 | 02.12.2021 | [2023/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4190692 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B64C13/28 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
B64C13/28 (EP);
B64C13/341 (EP);
B64C13/505 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSANORDNUNGEN | [2023/23] | English: | DRIVE ARRANGEMENTS | [2023/23] | French: | AGENCEMENTS DE COMMANDE | [2023/23] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2003080246 (KOIZUMI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,6 * figure - * [Y] 2; | [XY]EP1524188 (PARKER HANNIFIN CORP [US]) [X] 1,4,6 * paragraph [0011]; figure -; compounds 106,108 * [Y] 2; | [Y]CA2529534 (BOEING CO [US]) [Y] 2* page 8, lines 4-10 *; | [X]US2011048147 (KEECH NANCY KAY [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5,15 * paragraphs [0036] , [0055]; compounds 62a,62b,68,110 *; | [XY]WO2014041143 (SAGEM DEFENSE SECURITE [FR]) [X] 1,3,6,7 * page 1, lines 19-26; figures 1,6a,6b,7; compound 3 * [Y] 2; | [XY]US2015184700 (BALSIGER DERICK [US]) [X] 1,9,10 * paragraphs [0003] , [0020]; figure - * [Y] 2; | [XYI]RU2740466 (AKTSIONERNOE OBSHCHESTVO MOSKOVSKIJ NAUCHNO PROIZVODSTVENNYJ KOMPLEKS AVIONIKA IMENI O V USPENSKOGO [RU]) [X] 1,2,4,15 * paragraph [0013]; compounds 18,25 * [Y] 2 [I] 3 |