EP4106022 - OPTIMIZED LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centre national de la recherche scientifique 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | For all designated states Université Paris-Saclay 3, rue Joliot Curie Bâtiment Breguet 91190 Gif-sur-Yvette / FR | For all designated states INSTITUT D'OPTIQUE THEORIQUE ET APPLIQUEE 2 avenue Augustin Fresnel 91127 Palaiseau Cedex / FR | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/02] | For all designated states Centre national de la recherche scientifique 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Université Paris-Saclay 3, rue Joliot Curie Bâtiment Breguet 91190 Gif-sur-Yvette / FR | |||
For all designated states Institut Optique Theorique Appliquee 2 avenue Augustin Fresnel 91127 Palaiseau Cedex / FR | |||
Former [2022/51] | For all designated states Centre national de la recherche scientifique 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Université Paris-Saclay Immeuble Technologique, Entrée B Route de l'Orme aux Merisiers 91190 Saint-Aubin / FR | |||
For all designated states Institut Optique Theorique Appliquee 2 avenue Augustin Fresnel 91127 Palaiseau Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALEMBOIS, François 91870 BOISSY LE SEC / FR | 02 /
PICHON, Pierre 91120 PALAISEAU / FR | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | IPAZ Bâtiment Platon Parc Les Algorithmes 91190 Saint-Aubin / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/51] | Atout PI Laplace Immeuble "Visium" 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 21305827.4 | 17.06.2021 | [2022/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4106022 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/50, G01T1/20, // H01L25/075 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
H01L33/505 (EP,US);
H01L33/502 (US);
G01T1/2002 (EP,US);
G01T1/20185 (EP);
G01T1/20186 (US);
G02B6/0003 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] |
Former [2022/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTIMIERTE LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/51] | English: | OPTIMIZED LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE | [2022/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT OPTIMISÉ | [2022/51] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/30] | 19.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006233492 (SCHAAFSMA DAVID T [US]); | [XAI]US2016054501 (HIKMET RIFAT ATA MUSTAFA [NL], et al); | [A]RU2623688 (AKTSIONERNOE OBSHCHESTVO NAUCHNO-ISSLEDOVATELSKIJ INST POLYUS IM M F STELMAKHA [RU]); | [XA]US2019107635 (NEWMAN DAVID EDWARD [US]); | [XI]JP2021081297 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); |