EP4106152 - MAGNETIC MASS FOR A ROTOR, ASSOCIATED ROTOR AND ROTATING ELECTRIC MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Energy Power Conversion Technology Limited Thomson Houston Way Off Technology Drive Rugby, Warwickshire CV21 1BD / GB | [2024/04] |
Former [2022/51] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DURANTAY, Lionel 54250 Champigneulles / FR | 02 /
GROSSELIN, Christophe 54250 Champigneulles / FR | 03 /
ROMAIN, Dominique 54250 Champigneulles / FR | 04 /
ADAM, Grégoire 54250 Champigneulles / FR | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | Casalonga Casalonga & Partners Bayerstraße 71/73 80335 München / DE | [2022/51] | Application number, filing date | 21305836.5 | 17.06.2021 | [2022/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4106152 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02K3/24, H02K3/34, H02K3/487, H02K9/04, H02K9/10, H02K1/32 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
H02K3/24 (EP);
H02K1/32 (EP);
H02K3/34 (EP);
H02K3/487 (EP);
H02K9/04 (EP);
H02K9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] |
Former [2022/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAGNETISCHE MASSE FÜR EINEN ROTOR, ZUGEHÖRIGER ROTOR UND ROTIERENDE ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINE | [2022/51] | English: | MAGNETIC MASS FOR A ROTOR, ASSOCIATED ROTOR AND ROTATING ELECTRIC MACHINE | [2022/51] | French: | MASSE MAGNÉTIQUE POUR ROTOR, ROTOR ASSOCIÉ ET MACHINE TOURNANTE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2022/51] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 24.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH172839 (OERLIKON MASCHF [CH]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 23 - column 3, line 22; figures 1-3 *; | [X]CH180501 (PUNGA FRANKLIN PROFESSOR [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 20 - column 2, line 45; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]GB720295 (VICKERS ELECTRICAL CO LTD) [Y] 11,15* page 2, line 97 - page 3, line 61; figures 6-8 *; | [XY]US4282450 (ECKELS PHILLIP W) [X] 1,2,11,15 * column 5, line 15 - column 6, line 41; figures 4,5 * [Y] 11-15; | [Y]US6844637 (SMITH MATTHEW BERTRAM [US], et al) [Y] 11-15 * column 4, line 33 - column 7, line 46; figures 3-10 *; | [X]EP2852032 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0029]; figures 6-8 * | by applicant | US4709177 | US2002074869 | EP1455433 | US2006279145 | EP2120314 | US2010283335 | US2015162804 | US2019260268 |