EP4120201 - VOXELIZATION OF A 3D STRUCTURAL MEDICAL IMAGE OF A HUMAN BRAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 13.09.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dassault Systèmes 10, rue Marcel Dassault 78140 Vélizy-Villacoublay / FR | [2023/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOLLOMAJA, Borana Marseille / FR | 02 /
VUILLEMOT, Rémi Paris / FR | 03 /
GAZÈRES, Nicolas Vélizy-Villacoublay / FR | [2023/03] | Representative(s) | Bandpay & Greuter 11 rue Christophe Colomb 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/03] | Bandpay & Greuter 30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 21305997.5 | 16.07.2021 | [2023/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4120201 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06T17/00, G06T19/00 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
G06T17/005 (EP);
G06T17/205 (CN);
A61B5/4064 (US);
A61B5/369 (US);
G16H30/40 (EP);
G16H50/50 (EP);
A61B5/742 (US);
G06T2200/04 (CN);
G06T2210/36 (EP);
G06T2210/41 (EP,CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] |
Former [2023/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VOXELISIERUNG EINES MEDIZINISCHEN 3D-STRUKTURBILD DES MENSCHLICHEN GEHIRNS | [2023/03] | English: | VOXELIZATION OF A 3D STRUCTURAL MEDICAL IMAGE OF A HUMAN BRAIN | [2023/03] | French: | VOXÉLISATION D'UNE IMAGE MÉDICALE STRUCTURALE 3D D'UN CERVEAU HUMAIN | [2023/03] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/34] | 18.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007057945 (OLSON ERIC S [US]); |