EP4011343 - CLEANING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Besson, Aurélie 5, rue St-Pierre 59160 Croix / FR | [2022/37] |
Former [2022/24] | For all designated states Besson, Aurélie 6, rue Hemingway 59650 Villeneuve-d'Ascq / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/24] | Application number, filing date | 21315272.1 | 13.12.2021 | [2022/24] | Priority number, date | FR20200013162 | 14.12.2020 Original published format: FR 2013162 | [2022/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4011343 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/38 | [2022/24] | CPC: |
A61F13/38 (EP);
A61F13/385 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] |
Former [2022/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/24] | English: | CLEANING DEVICE | [2022/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE | [2022/24] | Examination procedure | 01.11.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | 01.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2754549 (TORRENT FREDERICK D) [A] 11-13 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1184690 (KARL HAHN K G [DE]) [A] 11-13* the whole document *; | [XI]EP0722705 (NOVAMONT SPA [IT]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * col.1-2 * [I] 7,8; | [XI]WO2008012798 (ABARBANEL MOSHE [IL]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9,10 * revendications * [I] 4,8; | [AD]EP2379319 (SCA TISSUE FRANCE [FR]) [AD] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [XI]US9555153 (HÄNI BEAT [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * revendications * [I] 7,8 | by applicant | EP2379319 |