EP4197678 - DOUBLE-SIDED TANGENTIAL CUTTING INSERT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seco Tools AB Björnbacksvägen 10 737 82 Fagersta / SE | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ejderklint, Christer 737 82 Fagersta / SE | 02 /
Michelet, Benjamin 737 82 Fagersta / SE | [2024/04] |
Former [2023/25] | 01 /
Ejderklint, Christer 737 82 FAGERSTA / SE | ||
02 /
Michelet, Benjamin 737 82 FAGERSTA / SE | Representative(s) | Sandvik Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [2023/25] | Application number, filing date | 21315281.2 | 17.12.2021 | [2023/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4197678 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/22 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
B23C5/2213 (EP);
B23C2200/0494 (EP);
B23C2200/085 (EP);
B23C2200/086 (EP);
B23C2200/367 (EP);
B23C2210/168 (EP);
B23C5/08 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/05] |
Former [2023/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DOPPELSEITIGER TANGENTIALER SCHNEIDEINSATZ | [2023/25] | English: | DOUBLE-SIDED TANGENTIAL CUTTING INSERT | [2023/25] | French: | INSERT DE COUPE TANGENTIEL À DOUBLE FACE | [2023/25] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/05] | 21.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO9717157 (INGERSOLL CUTTING TOOL [US], et al); | [XI]US6227772 (HEINLOTH MARKUS [DE], et al); | [A]US2007104546 (MAETA ATSUHIKO [JP], et al); | [A]US2011129309 (KOVAC JEFFREY FRANCIS [US], et al); | [A]US2011164932 (CHOI CHANG HEE [KR], et al); | [AD]EP2214857 (ISCAR LTD [IL]); | [AD]WO2012059395 (SECO TOOLS AB [SE], et al); | [AD]EP2507003 (KENNAMETAL INC [US]) | by applicant | WO9717157 | EP2214857 | WO2012059395 | EP2507003 |