EP4063573 - FIXING SYSTEM OF A WEAR ELEMENT IN A SUPPORT ELEMENT OF AN EARTH MOVING MACHINE THROUGH A PIN AND A RETAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metalogenia Research & Technologies S.L. Àvila 45 08005 Barcelona / ES | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rol Corredor, Javier 08930 Sant Adrià del Besós / ES | 02 /
Picon Manjón, Francesc 08320 El Masnou / ES | 03 /
Martinez Mañé, Angel 08303 Mataró / ES | 04 /
Marquez LLinas, Jordi 08223 Terrassa / ES | 05 /
Pérez Soria, Francisco 08430 La Roca del Vallès / ES | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Curell Suñol S.L.P. Muntaner 240, 4º 2ª 08021 Barcelona / ES | [2022/39] | Application number, filing date | 21382226.5 | 22.03.2021 | [2022/39] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4063573 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/28, F16B21/06 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
F16B21/18 (EP,KR);
E02F9/2825 (EP,KR,US);
E02F9/2833 (US);
E02F9/2841 (EP,KR);
F16B2/245 (EP,KR);
B60Y2200/412 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEFESTIGUNGSSYSTEM EINES VERSCHLEISSELEMENTS IN EINEM TRAGELEMENT EINER ERDBEWEGUNGSMASCHINE DURCH EINEN STIFT UND EINE HALTERUNG | [2022/39] | English: | FIXING SYSTEM OF A WEAR ELEMENT IN A SUPPORT ELEMENT OF AN EARTH MOVING MACHINE THROUGH A PIN AND A RETAINER | [2022/39] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FIXATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT D'USURE DANS UN ÉLÉMENT DE SUPPORT D'UN ENGIN DE TERRASSEMENT PAR L'INTERMÉDIAIRE D'UNE BROCHE ET D'UN DISPOSITIF DE RETENUE | [2022/39] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/37] | 20.04.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3997989 (STEPE VISVALDIS A); | [XY]EP1630426 (NEWFREY LLC [US]) |