EP4099405 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONNECTING SOLAR CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mondragon Assembly, S.Coop Poligono Industrial Bainetxe 5A y B 20500 Aretxabaleta / ES | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGUERRE, Jean-Philippe 20550 Aretxabaleta / ES | 02 /
APRAIZ ARENAZA, Aitor 20550 Aretxabaleta / ES | 03 /
HERNÁNDEZ MATEO, Xabier 20550 Aretxabaleta / ES | 04 /
MARTÍN OROBENGOA, Endika 20550 Aretxabaleta / ES | 05 /
GARCÍA ETXEBARRIA, Gorka 20550 Aretxabaleta / ES | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | Igartua, Ismael Galbaian S. Coop. Garaia Parke Teknologikoa Goiru Kalea 1 20500 Arrasate-Mondragón / ES | [2022/49] | Application number, filing date | 21382485.7 | 31.05.2021 | [2022/49] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4099405 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/05, H01L31/18 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
H01L31/0504 (EP);
H01L31/0508 (EP);
H01L31/188 (EP);
Y02E10/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] |
Former [2022/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBINDUNG VON SOLARZELLEN | [2022/49] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONNECTING SOLAR CELLS | [2022/49] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONNEXION DE CELLULES SOLAIRES | [2022/49] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/28] | 07.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2014132575 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) | by applicant | WO2012016103 | EP2793275 |