EP4142139 - ENERGY HARVESTING DEVICE AND SELF-POWERED SENSOR USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 08.09.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] | 08.09.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Consejo Superior de Investigaciones Científicas (CSIC) C/ Serrano 117 28006 Madrid / ES | [2023/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GHAFFARINEJAD, Ali 41092 Sevilla / ES | 02 /
BARRANCO QUERO, Angel 41092 Sevilla / ES | 03 /
GARCÍA CASAS, Xavier 41092 Sevilla / ES | 04 /
BORRAS MARTOS, Ana Isabel 41092 Sevilla / ES | 05 /
SÁNCHEZ VALENCIA, Juan Ramón 41092 Sevilla / ES | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Pons Glorieta Rubén Darío 4 28010 Madrid / ES | [2023/09] | Application number, filing date | 21382786.8 | 27.08.2021 | [2023/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4142139 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02N1/04 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
H02N1/04 (EP);
H02N11/002 (EP);
H02S10/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] |
Former [2023/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENERGIEGEWINNUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND SENSOR MIT EIGENER STROMQUELLE | [2023/09] | English: | ENERGY HARVESTING DEVICE AND SELF-POWERED SENSOR USING THE SAME | [2023/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COLLECTE D'ÉNERGIE ET CAPTEUR AUTO-ALIMENTÉ L'UTILISANT | [2023/09] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 01.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP3171416 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY [KR]) [X] 1-4,6-8,13,15,16 * paragraphs [0026] , [0030] , [0033] , [0034] , [0057] , [0058] * * figures 1,4 * [Y] 9 [I] 5,14; | [Y]KR20200021659 (UNIV INDUSTRY COOPERATION GROUP KYUNG HEE UNIV [KR]) [Y] 9 * paragraphs [0031] - [0035] ** figure 1 *; | [Y]KR20210004437 (POSTECH RES & BUSINESS DEV FOUND [KR], et al) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0029] * | by applicant | WO2015154693 | CN105099260 | US2019280620 |