EP4174876 - DEVICE FOR DETECTING LEAKS IN NUCLEAR FUEL ELEMENTS INSIDE STORAGE CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enusa Industrias Avanzadas S.A. S.M.E. C/ Santiago Rusiñol nº12 28040 Madrid / ES | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SÁNCHEZ HERNÁNDEZ, Ivan 28040 MADRID / ES | 02 /
RODERO RODERO, Jose, María 28040 MADRID / ES | 03 /
SÁNCHEZ SIGUERO, Alicia 28040 MADRID / ES | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Edificio Aqua - Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2023/18] | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Cedaceros, 1 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 21382986.4 | 02.11.2021 | [2023/18] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4174876 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G21F5/12, G21C17/06, G01T1/178 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
G21F5/125 (EP);
G21C17/06 (EP);
Y02E30/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/33] |
Former [2023/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR DETEKTION VON LECKS IN KERNBRENNELEMENTEN IM INNERN VON LAGERBEHÄLTERN | [2023/18] | English: | DEVICE FOR DETECTING LEAKS IN NUCLEAR FUEL ELEMENTS INSIDE STORAGE CONTAINERS | [2023/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE FUITES DANS DES ÉLÉMENTS DE COMBUSTIBLE NUCLÉAIRE À L'INTÉRIEUR DE CONTENEURS DE STOCKAGE | [2023/18] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/33] | 07.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2007248406 (ALOKA CO LTD) [Y] 1-3,5 * paragraphs [0002] - [0007]; figures 7, 8 *; | [YA]US9435899 (AIBA TOSHIHIDE [JP], et al) [Y] 5 * column 1, lines 32-42 * * column 3, lines 23-56 *[A] 1; | [XY]CN109493984 (NUCLEAR POWER INST CHINA, et al) [X] 1,2,4 * figures 1, 2; example 5 * [Y] 3-5; | [Y]CN111145923 (CHINA NUCLEAR POWER ENG CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1-5 * paragraphs [0048] - [0050]; figure 2 * |