EP4180323 - JOINING ELEMENT FOR TRAILING EDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aciturri Engineering, S.L. C/ Jerónimo Muñoz 8 Parque Technológico de Boecillo 47151 Boecillo Valladolid / ES | [2023/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAVONE, Paolo 47151 BOECILLO (Valladolid) / ES | 02 /
BERENDS ISASI, Daniel 47151 BOECILLO (Valladolid) / ES | 03 /
ORTEGA SAN MARTÍN, Javier 47151 BOECILLO (Valladolid) / ES | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Edificio Aqua - Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [2024/37] |
Former [2023/20] | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Cedaceros, 1 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 21383020.1 | 11.11.2021 | [2023/20] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4180323 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4180323 | Date: | 11.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B64C3/28 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
B64C3/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] |
Former [2023/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSELEMENT FÜR HINTERKANTE | [2023/20] | English: | JOINING ELEMENT FOR TRAILING EDGE | [2023/20] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE JONCTION POUR BORD DE FUITE | [2023/20] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2023 | Examination requested [2023/51] | 13.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4657615 (BRAUN RUDOLF [CA], et al); | [A]US2004000613 (THOMAS WILLIAM A [US]); | [A]US2014339370 (DE GREGORIO HURTADO YOLANDA [ES], et al); | [A]EP3683139 (AIRBUS OPERATIONS SLU [ES]) | by applicant | WO2004002820 |