EP4191247 - IN VITRO METHOD FOR THE DIAGNOSIS AND/OR PROGNOSIS OF MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALA Diagnostics, S.L. C/ Velázquez 10, 5º dcha. 28001 Madrid / ES | For all designated states Servicio Andaluz de Salud Avda. de la Constitución 18 41071 Sevilla / ES | For all designated states Universidad De Malaga Avenida Cervantes N° 2 E-29071 Málaga / ES | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERNÁNDEZ FERNÁNDEZ, Óscar 28001 Madrid / ES | 02 /
MONTERO MARTÍN-CALOTO, José Ramón 28001 Madrid / ES | 03 /
PAVÍA MOLINA, José 29071 Málaga / ES | 04 /
BARÓN LÓPEZ, Francisco Javier 29071 Málaga / ES | 05 /
OLIVER MARTOS, Begoña 29010 Málaga / ES | 06 /
HURTADO GUERRERO, Isaac 29010 Málaga / ES | 07 /
SERRANO CASTRO, Pedro Jesús 29010 Málaga / ES | 08 /
ALONSO TORRES, Ana 29010 Málaga / ES | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Hoffmann Eitle S.L.U. Paseo de la Castellana 140, 3a planta Edificio LIMA 28046 Madrid / ES | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 21383087.0 | 02.12.2021 | [2023/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4191247 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, A61B5/055 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
G01N33/6896 (EP);
A61B5/055 (EP);
A61B5/369 (EP);
A61B5/4076 (EP);
G01N33/6866 (EP);
G01N2333/7156 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IN-VITRO-VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE UND/ODER PROGNOSE VON MULTIPLER SKLEROSE | [2023/23] | English: | IN VITRO METHOD FOR THE DIAGNOSIS AND/OR PROGNOSIS OF MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS | [2023/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ IN VITRO DE DIAGNOSTIC ET/OU DE PRONOSTIC DE LA SCLÉROSE EN PLAQUES | [2023/23] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/19] | 05.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2016011212 (FERNÁNDEZ FERNÁNDEZ ÓSCAR [ES], et al); |