EP4116608 - VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goodrich Corporation Four Coliseum Centre 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, NC 28217 / US | [2023/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIELE, Micha 56-500 Wroclaw / PL | 02 /
CIERNIAK, Dawid 53-656 Wroc aw / PL | 03 /
BOGGS, Clifton Randolph Springfield, OH Ohio 45506 / US | [2023/02] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/02] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 21461567.6 | 09.07.2021 | [2023/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4116608 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16K1/38, F16K1/42, F16K25/00, F16K15/06 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
F16K1/38 (EP);
F16K15/026 (US);
B24B15/04 (US);
F16K1/42 (EP);
F16K15/063 (EP);
F16K25/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/32] |
Former [2023/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VENTIL | [2023/02] | English: | VALVE | [2023/02] | French: | VANNE | [2023/02] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/32] | 06.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006196553 (KANE BRIAN J [DE]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]US2016153583 (NAKAMURA YOSHINARI [JP]) [A] 4* abstract *; | [XI]US2016312902 (MIYAKE JUNYA [JP], et al) [X] 1-8,12 * paragraph [0043]; figures 1-6A * [I] 9-11,13-15 |