EP4199667 - POWER ELECTRONICS DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A COOLING SYSTEM FOR A POWER ELECTRONICS DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vitesco Technologies GmbH Siemensstraße 12 93055 Regensburg / DE | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Samson, Cristinel 81737 München / DE | 02 /
Murgoci, Dragos 81737 München / DE | [2023/25] | Representative(s) | Vitesco Technologies Landsberger Straße 187 - Haus D 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/25] | Vitesco Technologies Landsberger Str. 187, Haus D 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21465575.5 | 17.12.2021 | [2023/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4199667 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
H05K7/20927 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSELEKTRONIKVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KÜHLSYSTEMS FÜR EINE LEISTUNGSELEKTRONIKVORRICHTUNG | [2023/25] | English: | POWER ELECTRONICS DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A COOLING SYSTEM FOR A POWER ELECTRONICS DEVICE | [2023/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE DE PUISSANCE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN SYSTÈME DE REFROIDISSEMENT POUR UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE DE PUISSANCE | [2023/25] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/23] | 29.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2024/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE8804742U (---) [X] 1-5,8-12 * page 1, lines 7-13 * * page 3, lines 6-12 * * page 4, line 6 - page 5, line 11 * * page 6, line 32 - page 8, line 6 * * page 8, line 20 - page 10, line 22 * * figures 1-11 *; | [A]NL9401016 (MARTINUS CORNELUS VAN DER WALL [NL]) [A] 1-12 * pages 1-3 ** figures 1-4,6,10 *; | [A]US5526231 (ARZ WINFRIED [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 9 * * column 2, lines 55-60 * * column 3, lines 45-51 *; | [A]FR2729044 (ATHERM [FR]) [A] 1-12 * page 4, line 36 - page 5, line 10 * * page 7, lines 6-8 * * figures 6-7 *; | [X]US2005199373 (GODET CLAUDE [FR], et al) [X] 1,5-9,11,12 * figures 1-6 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0008] , [0012] - [0013] - [0015] - [0017] - [0019] - [0029] - [0037] , [0039] , [0042] - [0053] - [0057] *; | [A]US2017025326 (KOYAMA TAKAHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] , [0011] - [0013] - [0022] , [0029] , [0035] , [0037] , [0038] , [0045] , [0046] , [0049] , [0052] *; | [A]US2020137930 (BRUCKNER JENS [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0075] * * figure 8 * |