Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023017742 | Global Dossier | 19.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20305014 | 10.01.2020 | WO2021EP50023 | 04.01.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114730103B | Global Dossier | 25.06.2024 | B | CN114730103 | 08.07.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | EP20305014 | 10.01.2020 | WO2021EP50023 | 04.01.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4088157 | Global Dossier | 16.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20305014 | 10.01.2020 | WO2021EP50023 | 04.01.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021140070 | Global Dossier | 15.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20305014 | 10.01.2020 |