EP4088157 - POSITION VARIATIONS OF THE LENSES OF AN EYEWEAR EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Essilor International 147 Rue de Paris 94220 Charenton-Le-Pont / FR | [2022/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KELLER, Gerhard C/O ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL 147 rue de Paris 94220 CHARENTON-LE-PONT / FR | 02 /
LE CAIN, Aurélie C/O ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL 147 rue de Paris 94220 CHARENTON-LE-PONT / FR | 03 /
BARANTON, Konogan C/O ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL 147 rue de Paris 94220 CHARENTON-LE-PONT / FR | 04 /
FRICKER, Sébastien C/O ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL 147 rue de Paris 94220 CHARENTON-LE-PONT / FR | [2022/46] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Novitech 188 Grande rue Charles de Gaulle 94130 Nogent-sur-Marne / FR | [2022/46] | Application number, filing date | 21700072.8 | 04.01.2021 | [2022/46] | WO2021EP50023 | Priority number, date | EP20200305014 | 10.01.2020 Original published format: EP 20305014 | [2022/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021140070 | Date: | 15.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4088157 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02C13/00, A61B5/11 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
G02C13/005 (EP,US);
A61B5/1114 (EP,US);
A61B5/1121 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] | Title | German: | POSITIONSVARIATIONEN DER GLÄSER EINER BRILLENAUSRÜSTUNG | [2022/46] | English: | POSITION VARIATIONS OF THE LENSES OF AN EYEWEAR EQUIPMENT | [2022/46] | French: | VARIATIONS DE POSITION DES LENTILLES D'UN ÉQUIPEMENT DE LUNETTERIE | [2022/46] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/46] | 29.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE102004063160 (OLLENDORF HANS-JOACHIM [DE]); | [A]WO2008009355 (RODENSTOCK GMBH [DE], et al); | [X]DE102008018198 (OPTIK SCHLEMMER E K [DE]); | [X]EP3226068 (NIDEK KK [JP]); | [X]WO2018124311 (HOYA LENS THAILAND LTD [TH], et al); | [X]EP3422087 (ZEISS CARL VISION INT GMBH [DE]); | [AD]EP3561577 (ESSILOR INT [FR]); | by applicant | WO2016156600 | WO2019206905 |