EP4084959 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PRINTING SOLDER PASTE AND OTHER VISCOUS MATERIALS AT HIGH RESOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IO Tech Group, Ltd. 12b Shaftesbury Centre 85, Barlby Road London W10 6AZ / GB | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZENOU, Michael 12B Shaftesbury Centre 85 Barlby Road London W10 6AZ / GB | 02 /
GILAN, Ziv 12B Shaftesbury Centre 85 Barlby Road London W10 6AZ / GB | 03 /
NESHER, Guy 12B Shaftesbury Centre 85 Barlby Road London W10 6AZ / GB | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2022/45] | Application number, filing date | 21700086.8 | 05.01.2021 | [2022/45] | WO2021IB50025 | Priority number, date | US202062969233P | 03.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062969233 P | US202016807489 | 03.03.2020 Original published format: US202016807489 | [2022/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021156682 | Date: | 12.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4084959 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4084959 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B41M1/42, B41M1/22, B41M1/12, B41F16/00, H05K3/12 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
H05K3/1275 (EP,KR);
B41F16/0073 (EP,KR,US);
B23K1/0016 (EP,KR,US);
B05C1/08 (US);
B05C1/0813 (KR,US);
B05C5/02 (US);
B05C5/0245 (KR,US);
B05C5/027 (KR,US);
B05C9/14 (KR,US);
B05D1/26 (KR,US);
B05D1/28 (KR,US);
B05D3/06 (US);
B05D3/065 (KR,US);
B23K3/0638 (EP,KR);
B23K3/082 (EP,KR);
B41F15/0881 (EP,KR);
B41F16/006 (EP,KR);
B41F19/007 (EP,KR);
B41M3/006 (KR,US);
B41M5/025 (EP,KR);
H05K3/34 (US);
H05K3/3478 (EP,KR,US);
B23K2101/42 (EP,KR,US);
B41P2215/50 (EP,KR);
H05K2203/0156 (EP,KR);
H05K2203/0338 (EP,KR,US);
H05K2203/0528 (EP,KR);
H05K2203/0534 (EP,KR);
H05K2203/107 (EP,KR);
H05K2203/163 (EP,KR);
H05K3/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM DRUCKEN VON LÖTPASTE UND ANDEREN VISKOSEN MATERIALIEN MIT HOHER AUFLÖSUNG | [2022/45] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PRINTING SOLDER PASTE AND OTHER VISCOUS MATERIALS AT HIGH RESOLUTION | [2022/45] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'IMPRESSION DE PÂTE À BRASER ET D'AUTRES MATÉRIAUX VISQUEUX À HAUTE RÉSOLUTION | [2022/45] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 03.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 18.10.2023 | ES | 18.10.2023 | HR | 18.10.2023 | MC | 18.10.2023 | PL | 18.10.2023 | RO | 18.10.2023 | RS | 18.10.2023 | SK | 18.10.2023 | SM | 18.10.2023 | NO | 18.01.2024 | GR | 19.01.2024 | IS | 18.02.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RO | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SK | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RO | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 18.10.2023 | |
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 18.10.2023 | |
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 19.01.2024 | |
IS | 18.02.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]WO0172489 (ALGERI MARIS [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,16,17,19 * page 27, line 16 - page 31, line 23; figures 34-37; claims 1,2 * [A] 3,7-15,18 [I] 6,20; | [A]US2007164089 (GAUGLER KEVIN W [US]) [A] 1-20* paragraphs [0002] , [0009] - paragraph [0030]; figures 1-3; claims 1-4 *; | [XA]US2015239236 (STEFANI FRANCO [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,16,17 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0069]; figures 1-9; claims 1-18 * [A] 3-15,18-20 | by applicant | US6122036 | US2005109734 | WO2007084888 | US2011017841 | US8740040 | WO2016198291 | EP3219412 | US9808822 |