EP4091098 - METHOD FOR PROCESSING A CANDIDATE IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SURYS 22, avenue de l'Europe Parc d Activité Gustave Eiffel Bussy Saint Georges 77607 Marne la Vallee Cedex 3 / FR | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAHFOUDI, Gaël chez Innovation Competence Group 310 AVENUE BERTHELOT 69372 LYON CEDEX 08 / FR | 02 /
PIC, Marc chez Innovation Competence Group 310 AVENUE BERTHELOT 69372 LYON CEDEX 08 / FR | 03 /
MORAIN-NICOLIER, Frédéric chez Innovation Competence Group 310 AVENUE BERTHELOT 69372 LYON CEDEX 08 / FR | 04 /
RETRAINT, Florent chez Innovation Competence Group 310 AVENUE BERTHELOT 69372 LYON CEDEX 08 / FR | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Bouvier, Thibault INPUT IP C/O INNOV-GROUP 310 Avenue Berthelot 69372 Lyon Cedex 08 / FR | [2022/47] | Application number, filing date | 21700314.4 | 15.01.2021 | [2022/47] | WO2021EP50816 | Priority number, date | FR20200000395 | 16.01.2020 Original published format: FR 2000395 | [2022/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021144427 | Date: | 22.07.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4091098 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/20, G06K9/34, G06K9/46, G06K9/62, G06K9/68, G07D7/206 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
G07D7/206 (EP,US);
G06F18/2321 (EP);
G06F18/24133 (EP);
G06F18/24147 (EP);
G06V10/82 (EP,US);
G06V30/1448 (EP,US);
G06V30/153 (EP,US);
G06V30/18143 (EP,US);
G06V30/19067 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG EINES KANDIDATENBILDES | [2022/47] | English: | METHOD FOR PROCESSING A CANDIDATE IMAGE | [2022/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE IMAGE CANDIDATE | [2022/47] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 12.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2007050360 (HULL JONATHAN J [US], et al); | [A]US2011255795 (NAKAMURA HIROSHI [JP]); | [A]US2014219561 (NAKAMURA HIROSHI [JP]) |