EP4090774 - BACILLUS STRAINS WITH THE ABILITY TO DEGRADE INORGANIC NITROGEN COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Operations GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIATSIS, Christos Kriegerweg 16 48153 Münster / DE | 02 /
DARGATZ, Michelle Schumannstrasse 4 33604 Bielefeld / DE | 03 /
STANNEK-GÖBEL, Lorena Schloßhofstraße 171 b 33615 Bielefeld / DE | 04 /
PELZER, Stefan Ludwig-Uhland-Str. 33a 33335 Gütersloh / DE | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Evonik Patent Association c/o Evonik Industries AG IP Management Bau 1042A/PB 15 Paul-Baumann-Straße 1 45772 Marl / DE | [2022/47] | Application number, filing date | 21700365.6 | 06.01.2021 | [2022/47] | WO2021EP50111 | Priority number, date | EP20200151668 | 14.01.2020 Original published format: EP 20151668 | [2022/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021144172 | Date: | 22.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4090774 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12R1/125, A01N63/20, C02F3/34 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
A01N63/20 (EP);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
C02F3/34 (EP,US);
C02F2101/16 (EP,US);
C02F2101/163 (EP);
C02F3/341 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] | Title | German: | BACILLUS-STÄMME MIT FÄHIGKEIT ZUM ABBAU ANORGANISCHER STICKSTOFFVERBINDUNGEN | [2022/47] | English: | BACILLUS STRAINS WITH THE ABILITY TO DEGRADE INORGANIC NITROGEN COMPOUNDS | [2022/47] | French: | SOUCHES DE BACILLUS AYANT LA CAPACITÉ DE DÉGRADER DES COMPOSÉS AZOTÉS INORGANIQUES | [2022/47] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 21.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]CN105969708 (UNIV ZHEJIANG, et al) [X] 1,3,6,8,12,15 * the whole document * * table 1 * *Embodiment 3* [I] 4,5,7; | [I]WO2018045004 (AGRINOS AS [NO]) [I] 17 * sequence 42 * * figure 7 ** paragraph [0077] *; | [XI] - A. FARZANFAR, "The use of probiotics in shrimp aquaculture", FEMS IMMUNOLOGY AND MEDICAL MICROBIOLOGY., NL, (20061101), vol. 48, no. 2, doi:10.1111/j.1574-695X.2006.00116.x, ISSN 0928-8244, pages 149 - 158, XP055238746 [X] 1-3,6,8-16 *On crustaceans*; page 150, column 1 - column 2 * * page 151, column 1, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 153, column 2, paragraph 4 - page 154; table 1 * * page 155, column 1, paragraph last * [I] 4,5,7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1574-695X.2006.00116.x | [XI] - HUANG FEI ET AL, "Characterization of novelBacillusstrain N31 from mariculture water capable of halophilic heterotrophic nitrification-aerobic denitrification", JOURNAL OF BIOSCIENCE AND BIOENGINEERING, (20171101), vol. 124, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.JBIOSC.2017.06.008, ISSN 1389-1723, pages 564 - 571, XP085237801 [X] 1-3,6,8-14 * the whole document * [I] 11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jbiosc.2017.06.008 | by applicant | EP0287699 | US4919936 | WO9828408 | US6060051 | WO0043503 | WO03066847 | US6849256 | US7247299 | US2014010792 | US2016326034 | - PARENTE, E.BRIENZA, C.MOLES, M.RICCIARDI, A, "A comparison of methods for the measurement of bacteriocin activity", Journal of microbiological methods, (19950000), vol. 22, no. 1, pages 95 - 108, XP002305604 | - CHATTERJEE, SHALDAR, S, "Vibrio Related Diseases in Aquaculture and Development of Rapid and Accurate Identification Methods", J. Marine Sci. Res. Dev, (20120000), vol. S1, page 002 | - PULKKINEN, K.SUOMALAINEN, L.-R.READ, A. F.EBERT, D.RINTAMAKI, PVALTONEN, E.T., "Intensive fish farming and the evolution of pathogen virulence: the case of columnaris disease in Finland", Proc. R. Soc. B, (20100000), vol. 277, pages 593 - 600 | - MISHRA, A.NAM, G. H.GIM, J.A.LEE, H.E.JO, AKIM, H.S., "Current Challenges of Streptococcus Infection and Effective Molecular, Cellular, and Environmental Control Methods in Aquaculture", Mol. Cells, (20180000), vol. 41, no. 6, pages 495 - 505 |