EP4098041 - METHODS FOR AN ENHANCED PAGING OF A WIRELESS DEVICE OF A SET OF WIRELESS DEVICES, RELATED NETWORK NODES AND WIRELESS DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | For:AL
Sony Europe B.V. The Heights, Brooklands Weybridge, Surrey KT13 0XW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/49] | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-Ku, Tokyo, 108-0075 / JP | ||
For:AL
Sony Europe B.V. The Heights, Brooklands Weybridge, Surrey KT13 0XW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAZLOUM, Nafiseh Byggmästaregatan 8a 222 37 Lund / SE | 02 /
RUSEK, Fredrik Anders Sassers v 25 241 35 Esloev / SE | 03 /
FLORDELIS, Jose Strängvägen 1 224 72 Lund / SE | 04 /
HILL, Johan Dragavägen 13 224 74 Lund / SE | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | Aera A/S Niels Hemmingsens Gade 10, 5th Floor 1153 Copenhagen K / DK | [2022/49] | Application number, filing date | 21700428.2 | 13.01.2021 | [2022/49] | WO2021EP50512 | Priority number, date | SE20200050077 | 28.01.2020 Original published format: SE 2050077 | [2022/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021151658 | Date: | 05.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4098041 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W68/02, H04B7/02, H04W68/00, H04W52/00 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
H04W68/005 (EP,US);
H04W52/0216 (EP,US);
H04W52/0229 (US);
H04W52/0235 (EP);
H04B7/0695 (EP);
H04W56/0015 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR EIN VERBESSERTES PAGING EINER DRAHTLOSEN VORRICHTUNG EINER GRUPPE VON DRAHTLOSEN VORRICHTUNGEN, ZUGEHÖRIGE NETZKNOTEN UND DRAHTLOSE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2022/49] | English: | METHODS FOR AN ENHANCED PAGING OF A WIRELESS DEVICE OF A SET OF WIRELESS DEVICES, RELATED NETWORK NODES AND WIRELESS DEVICES | [2022/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉS POUR UNE RADIOMESSAGERIE AMÉLIORÉE D'UN DISPOSITIF SANS FIL D'UN ENSEMBLE DE DISPOSITIFS SANS FIL, NOEUDS DE RÉSEAU ASSOCIÉS ET DISPOSITIFS SANS FIL | [2022/49] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | 07.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO2017091114 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M (PUBL) [SE]) [X] 1,2,8-13,15,19,20 * page 16, line 6 - line 24 * * page 16, line 25 - line 29 * * page 16, line 30 - page 17, line 3 * * page 17, line 6 - line 7 * * page 17, line 9 - line 14 * * claim 10 * * figures 9, 10 * [Y] 6,16 [I] 3-5,7,14,17,18; | [YA]US2017257842 (HESSLER MARTIN [SE], et al) [Y] 6,16 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0080] *[A] 1-5,7-15,17-20 |