EP4093553 - ATOMISER FOR SPRAYING A LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vangeel Electrical M.S.F. Avenue de Philippeville 187 6001 Marcinelle / BE | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE CARITAT DE PERUZZIS, Renier c/o Vangeel Electrical M.S.F. Avenue de Philippeville 187 6001 Marcinelle / BE | 02 /
DE CARITAT DE PERUZZIS, Olivier c/o Vangeel Electrical M.S.F. Avenue de Philippeville 187 6001 Marcinelle / BE | 03 /
HELBOIS, Xavier c/o Vangeel Electrical M.S.F. Avenue de Philippeville 187 6001 Marcinelle / BE | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Calysta NV Lambroekstraat 5a 1831 Diegem / BE | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 21700947.1 | 20.01.2021 | [2022/48] | WO2021EP51170 | Priority number, date | BE20200005046 | 23.01.2020 Original published format: BE 202005046 | [2022/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021148452 | Date: | 29.07.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4093553 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B05B3/10, F24F6/16, B08B17/00 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
B05B3/1021 (EP);
B05B3/1064 (EP);
F24F6/16 (EP);
Y02B30/54 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Title | German: | ZERSTÄUBER ZUM VERSPRÜHEN EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT | [2022/48] | English: | ATOMISER FOR SPRAYING A LIQUID | [2022/48] | French: | ATOMISEUR POUR LA PULVERISATION D'UN LIQUIDE | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 18.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3361352 (ALAN HARRIS DAVID) [A] 1 * columns 1,2,3, lines 11-13,68-72,1-27,46-63; figures 1-4 *; | [XY]US3552650 (PATRICK KEITH HILTON) [X] 1,2,12-14,17-19 * columns 1,2, lines 4-8,59-64; figures 1-5 * [Y] 1-10,13,17,21; | [YA]GB1361606 (MICRONAIR AERIAL) [Y] 6-10,21 * pages 1,2, lines 9-15 and 51-73,19-77; figures 1-3 * [A] 1; | [YA]FR2507104 (MICRONAIR AERIAL [GB]) [Y] 3-10 * pages 1,3,4,5, lines 1-12,23-31,11-36,11-33; figures 1-2 * [A] 1,2; | [Y]WO0072975 (RAD TECHNOLOGY PTY LTD [AU], et al) [Y] 6-10 * pages 1,11, lines 7-14,4-10; figures 1-8 *; | [XI]US2002100815 (DOEBLER DAVID S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,11-14,17-19 * paragraphs [0003] , [0031] - [0034] * [I] 15,16; | [XY]WO02075228 (KOLLER HARALD [AT]) [X] 20 * columns 4,5, paragraphs 23-31,24-33; figures 1-6 * [Y] 1-5,13,17,21; | [A] - Renier De Caritat ET AL, "microniser - Rotating cage atomiser - Humidification and adiabatic Cooling", (20171221), pages 1 - 6, URL: https://03e97f83-c4f6-4db2-b58a-e4f99c8fc6fb.filesusr.com/ugd/5020d3_772ac9b4a2d145d89bee284b1c51aaaf.pdf, (20200922), XP055732840 [A] 1-21 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002]; figures 1,3 * | by applicant | US3361352 | GB1361606 | FR2507104 | CN201728167U | CN106787379 |