EP4100169 - SPRAY UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.07.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 1 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAERS, Malcolm Benrather Schlossallee 92 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
SATO, Yoshitaka c/o Bayer CropScience K.K. 1-6-5, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8262 / JP | 03 /
CHAPPLE, Andrew Charles Färberstr. 7a 40764 Langenfeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/50] | 01 /
FAERS, Malcolm Benrather Schlossallee 92 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02 /
SATO, Yoshitaka c/o Bayer CropScience K.K. 1-6-5, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100--8262 / JP | |||
03 /
CHAPPLE, Andrew, Charles Färberstr. 7a 40764 Langenfeld / DE | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 21700954.7 | 21.01.2021 | [2022/50] | WO2021EP51237 | Priority number, date | EP20200155552 | 05.02.2020 Original published format: EP 20155552 | [2022/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021156061 | Date: | 12.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4100169 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B05B5/00, B05B3/00 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
B05B3/1092 (EP,KR,US);
B05B3/105 (EP,KR,US);
B05B13/005 (EP,KR,US);
A01M7/0028 (KR,US);
A01M7/005 (KR,US);
A01M7/0082 (KR,US);
A01M7/0089 (KR,US);
B64C39/024 (KR);
B64D1/18 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Title | German: | SPRÜHEINHEIT | [2022/50] | English: | SPRAY UNIT | [2022/50] | French: | UNITÉ DE PULVÉRISATION | [2022/50] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 05.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US3843054 (KENDALL R, et al); | [XA]US4360155 (HUBBELL MARK E, et al); | [XA]US5529246 (SAITO EIJI [JP], et al) |