Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023054431 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20152261 | 16.01.2020 | WO2021NL50026 | 18.01.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4091337 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20152261 | 16.01.2020 | WO2021NL50026 | 18.01.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021145769 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20152261 | 16.01.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3852387 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20152261 | 16.01.2020 |