EP4091337 - SOUND DETECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast-natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN NEER, Paul Louis Maria Joseph c/o TNO IP & Contracting Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | 02 /
HARMSMA, Peter Johan c/o TNO IP & Contracting Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | 03 /
PIRAS, Daniele c/o TNO IP & Contracting Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | 04 /
ALTMANN, Robert Karl c/o TNO IP & Contracting Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | 05 /
VAN DER HEIDEN, Maurits Sebastiaan c/o TNO IP & Contracting Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2022/47] | Application number, filing date | 21701029.7 | 18.01.2021 | [2022/47] | WO2021NL50026 | Priority number, date | EP20200152261 | 16.01.2020 Original published format: EP 20152261 | [2022/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021145769 | Date: | 22.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4091337 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/40, H04R3/00, H04R1/34, H04R23/00, H04R17/02 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
H04R1/406 (EP,US);
H04R3/005 (EP,US);
H04R1/342 (EP,US);
H04R17/02 (EP);
H04R2201/003 (EP);
H04R2201/401 (EP,US);
H04R2201/403 (EP);
H04R23/008 (EP,US);
H04R2410/01 (US);
H04R2410/03 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] | Title | German: | SCHALLERFASSUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/47] | English: | SOUND DETECTION DEVICE | [2022/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE SON | [2022/47] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 21.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH1048039 (GE YOKOGAWA MED SYST LTD); | [I]WO2005074317 (DPA MICROPHONES AS [DK], et al); | [Y]EP2988527 (PATENTS FACTORY LTD SP Z O O [PL]); | [A]WO2016073936 (CHIRP MICROSYSTEMS [US]); | by applicant | US2005074317 | EP2988527 | WO2016073936 |