EP4098006 - BASE STATION, ACCESS MOBILITY MANAGEMENT ENTITY, EVOLVED SERVING MOBILE LOCATION CENTER AND USER EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | For:AL
Sony Europe B.V. The Heights, Brooklands Weybridge, Surrey KT13 0XW / GB | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHARMA, Vivek c/o SONY Europe B.V. IP Europe Jays Close, Viables Basingstoke Hampshire RG22 4SB / GB | 02 /
WAKABAYASHI, Hideji c/o SONY Europe B.V. IP Europe Jays Close, Viables Basingstoke Hampshire RG22 4SB / GB | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB Amalienstraße 62 80799 München / DE | [2022/49] | Application number, filing date | 21701157.6 | 27.01.2021 | [2022/49] | WO2021EP51846 | Priority number, date | EP20200154954 | 31.01.2020 Original published format: EP 20154954 | [2022/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021151933 | Date: | 05.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4098006 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/037, H04W12/0431 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
H04W12/037 (EP);
H04W12/03 (US);
H04W12/041 (US);
H04W12/0431 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] | Title | German: | BASISSTATION, ZUGRIFFSMOBILITÄTSVERWALTUNGSENTITÄT, ENTWICKELTES VERSORGENDES MOBILES STANDORTZENTRUM UND BENUTZERGERÄT | [2022/49] | English: | BASE STATION, ACCESS MOBILITY MANAGEMENT ENTITY, EVOLVED SERVING MOBILE LOCATION CENTER AND USER EQUIPMENT | [2022/49] | French: | STATION DE BASE, ENTITÉ DE GESTION DE MOBILITÉ D'ACCÈS, CENTRE DE LOCALISATION MOBILE DE DESSERTE ÉVOLUÉ ET ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR | [2022/49] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | 24.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2018204554 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1-4,6-12,14-16,18-20,22-27 * paragraphs [0093] - [0098] - [ 126] , [ 153] - [0187]; figure 2 * [I] 5,13,17,21; | [A]WO2019061208 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-27 * abstract *; | [AP]US2020229131 (LI CHENWAN [CN], et al) [AP] 1-27 * paragraphs [0019] , [0 36] , [0037] , [0 95] - [0098] - [ 107] , [ 145] *; | [A] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Discussion on encryption of broadcasted assistance data", vol. RAN WG2, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20171009 - 20171013, (20171008), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1711320 DISCUSSION ON ENCRYPTING BROADCASTED ASSISTANCE DATA, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20171008), XP051343309 [A] 1-27 * section 2 * | [A] - ERICSSON, "On representation, broadcast and ciphering of positioning SIBs", vol. RAN WG2, no. Busan, Korea; 20180521 - 20180525, (20180520), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1808111 ON REPRESENTATION, BROADCAST AND CIPHERING OF POSITIONING SIBS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-AN, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20180520), XP051444430 [A] 1-27 * section 2.1 * | by applicant | WO2019096901 | WO2019096949 | - 3GPP documents TS 36.33 | - TS 36.355 |